RI H7950 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Middletown Municipal Court to impose fines not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Powers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-04HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback