RI H7950 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - False Claim Act (would Authorize City And Town Solicitors To Bring Civil Actions Under The State False Claim Act.)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - False Claim Act (would Authorize City And Town Solicitors To Bring Civil Actions Under The State False Claim Act.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-30 | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7950.pdf |