RI H7939 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 24 Senate Commerce Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Streamlines the application and examination process as well as the educational and experience standards for applicants seeking registration as professional land surveyors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Surveyors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2018-05-08HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/08/2018)
2018-05-01HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-03-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback