RI H7938 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates arming campus police at public higher educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related To Education - Maintenance Of Order On Campus [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018)
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback