RI H7935 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any day(s) when the department of health is closed be excluded from the maximum number of days within which a hearing must be held by the board when a physician or limited registrant's license is suspended without hearing.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-05-04 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |