RI H7929 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "credit amount" and "credit week" for purposes of calculating an individual's earned wages, amends the definition of "employment" and indicates that certain services performed by family members not be considered employment.
Title
Employment Security--general Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |