RI H7912 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that insurance policies for property damage and personal injuries, other than payment of compensation for workers compensation, state policy limits and no amount of the policy may be used to pay costs to defend a claim.
Title
Liability Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7912.pdf |