RI H7912 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the appointment of more than one district court clerk/magistrate by the chief judge of the district court.
Title
Courts - District Court
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 19 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-13 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-23 | House | Meeting postponed (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |