RI H7909 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds insurance provided in the surplus lines market to the payment of premiums and cancellation regulations contained in the unfair competition and practices chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus Lines Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseVetoed by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-05-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2018)
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-26HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/27/2018)
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback