RI H7905 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2018)
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2018)
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for employers, in workers' compensation actions, to shift the legal burden to employees to prove they were not intoxicated at the time of injury or death, after a showing that the employee had a positive test for intoxicating substances.
Title
Workers' Compensation -- Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2018) |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7905.pdf |