RI H7901 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands eligibility for elderly services assistance to persons under age 65 suffering from physician confirmed Alzheimer's disease related dementia with income not to exceed 250% of federal poverty level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Community Care Services To The Elderly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback