RI H7896 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a producer responsibility program for printed paper and packaging.
Title
Producer Responsibility Program For Printed Paper And Packaging
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Meeting postponed (03/17/2016) |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7896.pdf |