RI H7892 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends and restates the charter of the Greater Providence YMCA and provides for governance by a board of directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Amendment And Consolidation Of The Charter Of The Greater Providence Young Men's Christian Association

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-16SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/16/2018)
2018-05-10SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2018-04-25HouseHouse read and passed
2018-04-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-30HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2018)
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback