RI H7889 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies the procedures for seeking a protective order from district or family court and the requirements of the surrender of any firearms. Repeals outdated family court form for complaints for protection from abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Assault

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-04-23HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2018)
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback