RI H7888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Christopher Blazejewski to join the Honorable Lauren Carson and Guy E. Cummings in marriage on or about May 22, 2020, within the Town of Portsmouth, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | House | House read and passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/10/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |