RI H7884 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires any mayoral academy which is part of a network that seeks to be established or expanded to provide evidence that its attrition rates, special education rates and suspension rates are within acceptable averages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mayoral Academies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Education
2018-06-06HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-30HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-05-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018)
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback