RI H7882 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows David Rathbun to join Miranda Giusti and Cory Richard Burmeister in marriage on or about June 20, 2020, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | House | House read and passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |