RI H7878 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies the law and allows taxicabs, and public motor vehicles owners to file private lawsuits against the violators of public vehicle laws, order, rules or regulations.
Title
Public Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7878.pdf |