RI H7875 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a licensed pharmacist, who successfully completes a course on tobacco cessation therapy, to prescribe and dispense tobacco cessation drug products to a qualified patient pursuant to rules adopted by the board of pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7875.pdf |