RI H7871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the board of directors of the Rhode Island Commerce Corporation shall include a senior manager of a business which derives a majority of its revenue from the defense industry and has facilities located in the state.
Title
Rhode Island Commerce Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7871.pdf |