RI H7869 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines captive hunting as a hunt that occurs within a structure designed to restrict the free movement of animals and prevents the animal from escaping and would prohibit captive hunting within the state of Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Fish And Wildlife –- Field Trials And Shooting Preserves
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7869.pdf |