RI H7865 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a Day of Portugal and Portuguese Heritage in RI, Inc. motor vehicle license plate.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-07 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2018) |
2018-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |