RI H7860 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the income eligibility limit for medical assistance coverage for seniors and disabled individuals from one hundred percent (100%) to one hundred thirty-three percent (133%) of federal poverty level.
Title
Health Care For Elderly And Disabled
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7860.pdf |