RI H7852 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that family court schedule hearing to modify or suspend child support orders for an obligor who is incarcerated and prohibits hearing to determine obligor's ability to pay sooner than forty-five (45) days after release from prison.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7852.pdf |