RI H7851 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Jared Crotty to join Jordan Eramo and Benjamin Becker in marriage on or about August 17, 2014, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | House read and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |