RI H7850 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires ten percent (10%) of school aid be allocated to school safety measures.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7850.pdf |