RI H7844 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allow for the probation and parole unit of the department of corrections to seek permission from the superior or district court to modify a defendant's conditions of probation to more effectively supervise the defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence And Execution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Sentence and execution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08SenateSigned by Governor
2014-07-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2014-06-21HouseSenate passed in concurrence
2014-06-21HousePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
2014-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2014-06-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014)
2014-06-11HouseReferred to Senate Judiciary
2014-06-10HouseHouse read and passed
2014-06-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/10/2014)
2014-06-03HouseCommittee recommends passage
2014-05-30HouseScheduled for consideration (06/03/2014)
2014-03-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-03-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2014)
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback