RI H7842 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- MANUFACTURING AND WHOLESALE LICENSES - Allows for the holder of a manufacturer’s license to be able to sell one one-sixth (1/6) barrel key of malt beverage, produced on the premises, per day.
Title
Allows for the holder of a manufacturer’s license to be able to sell one one-sixth (1/6) barrel key of malt beverage, produced on the premises, per day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7842.pdf |