RI H7840 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/29/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/29/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that electronic money transfers include transactions of virtual currency and would amend the provisions on notices in connection with the voluntary restructuring of solvent insurers to eliminate the requirement of first class mail.
Title
Regulatory Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7840.pdf |