RI H7838 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain provisions of the general laws governing the licensing of accountants to eliminate outmoded, inconsistent and unnecessary regulations.
Title
Accountancy
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2016-05-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/11/2016) |
2016-05-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |