RI H7819 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clearly defines permanent state records to be retained/ requires preparation of disaster preparedness plan/ allows access to superior court for injunctions/ restraining orders for violations of public records laws.
Title
State Archives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-12 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |