RI H7813 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the host city or town to impose a two percent (2%) tax on the endowment of a private institution of higher education, to be used only for the host's public school district.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7813.pdf |