RI H7811 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- 2024 ENERGY STORAGE ACT - Requires the office of energy resources to initiate the process of developing programs and associated funding mechanisms, for electric energy storage resources connected to the electric distribution system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of energy resources to initiate the process of developing programs and associated funding mechanisms, for electric energy storage resources connected to the electric distribution system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-26HouseSigned by Governor
2024-06-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2024-06-14SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2024-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024)
2024-06-13HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2024-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2024)
2024-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-03-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024)
2024-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback