RI H7809 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases threshold amount for contractor bonds to $100,000, allows for waiver of bond on projects up to $250,000, reduces time for payments to contractors and subcontractors and authorizes related regulations.
Title
Relating To Public Property And Works
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7809.pdf |