RI H7808 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - House voted to recommit to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - House voted to recommit to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Assess Rhode Island's "fair Funding Formula" (creates A Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study And Assessment Of Rhode Island's "fair Funding Formula.")
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Assess Rhode Island's "fair Funding Formula" (creates A Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study And Assessment Of Rhode Island's "fair Funding Formula.")
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | House | House voted to recommit to House Finance |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee continued |
2014-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee continued |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7808.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7808A.pdf |