RI H7807 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes criminal penalties for a wanton or reckless act or omission of a parent, guardian or any other person who has custody or control of a child that result in substantial risk of serious bodily injury or sexual abuse of a child in their care.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |