RI H7805 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of unusable and usable marijuana that a patient cardholder and primary caregiver cardholder would be allowed to have in their possession.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7805.pdf |