RI H7803 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enables the creation of a public registry of home health aides, giving seniors and individuals living with disabilities another choice when accessing long-term care options.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Quality Self-directed Services -- Public Officers And Employees -- Individual Providers Of Direct Support Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback