RI H7801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a plan to improve the promotion of social and emotional well-being of young children as well as screening, assessment, diagnosis and treatment of mental health challenges of infants and young children under the age of six (6).
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |