RI H7801 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Possibility Of Transitioning The State Of Rhode Island To The Establishment Of A Biennial Budget (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study Of The Possibility Of Transitioning The State To The Establishment Of A Biennial Budget, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly And The Governor By February 1, 2019, And Expire On July 1, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Possibility Of Transitioning The State Of Rhode Island To The Establishment Of A Biennial Budget (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study Of The Possibility Of Transitioning The State To The Establishment Of A Biennial Budget, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly And The Governor By February 1, 2019, And Expire On July 1, 2019.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback