RI H7800 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides the method by which records are to be furnished relative to an employee's statement of earnings.
Title
Payment Of Wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |