RI H7798 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the director of the department of labor and training to establish a list, on the department's website, of all employers that owe their employees' wages.
Title
Payment Of Wages
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/15/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7798.pdf |