RI H7793 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new electricians license called the "sign renovation electrical license" limited to the removal or installation of signs only if the removal or installation of the sign requires removing or installing three (3) wires.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2014-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |