RI H7792 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permit title insurance companies and their agents to issue closing funds protection insurance on residential property closings for property consisting of four (4) units or less.
Title
Title Insurers Issuing Closing Or Settlement Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |