RI H7790 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the renewal period for lottery sales agent's license from one year to two (2) years.
Title
State Lottery - Lottery Sales Agent Renewal Period
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |