RI H7788 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits, beginning January 1, 2024, any compact fluorescent lamp or linear fluorescent lamp to be offered for final sale, sold at final sale, or distributed in the state as a new manufactured product.
Title
Mercury Reduction And Education Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |