RI H7785 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifically authorizes the governor and the reciprocity board to enter into motor vehicle and disability parking reciprocity agreements with the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.
Title
Reciprocity Agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7785.pdf |