RI H7783 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates builders of new 1 and 2 family dwellings to provide written info to buyer about installation of automatic sprinkler system subject to civil penalties for violations/results of radon tests/certification of working smoke detector devices eff 1/1/19
Title
New Home Buyers Fire Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7783.pdf |