RI H7781 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends a number of provisions in the general laws relative to financial institutions by eliminating unnecessary requirements and/or clarifying language in order to reduce certain burdens on businesses operating in Rhode Island.
Title
Creation And Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-03-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |