RI H7779 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Brings the Rhode Island Life and Health Guaranty Fund statute into conformance with the latest version of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Model Act.
Title
Rhode Island Life And Health Guaranty Association Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2022-04-26 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |